U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08067
  • Case Name: Pronghorn Rental Homes LLC v. Boxabl Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 15, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • April 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • April 10, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.