U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00281
  • Case Name: Martin v. Arizona School for the Deaf and Blind et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.