U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02597
  • Case Name: ANTHONY JOSEPH HURTADO and ZULEICA HURTADO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice of Filing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Schedules]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1 CREDITOR - Notice of Appearance/Request for Notice (batch) (document required)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.