U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00664
  • Case Name: Adame v. North Mountain Foothills Apartments LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 26, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.