U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02610-
  • Case Name: ROBERT WAYNE ROBINSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Filing Fee Paid--Amendment]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oNonpayment of Required Filing Fee - VAN Form]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Appearance (Notice of)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Receipt for Overage]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.