U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10916-
  • Case Name: MARK STEPHEN RUFF and MARJORIE JEANNE RUFF
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Submission of Proposed Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Notice of)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.