U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10904-
  • Case Name: MODENA HAYSLIP BRADY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Amended Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.