U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:24-bk-08797-
  • Case Name: IAN HERROLD NELSON and KAITLYN ANNE LOUISE NELSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Appointment of Trustee]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request to Set Claims Bar Date]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [oReopening Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Motion to Reopen Case (Reopen Fee Due)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.