U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-01503-
  • Case Name: SHAYNE PAUL JONES, II and BRITNEY RENE BURNS-JONES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request to Set Claims Bar Date]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.