U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10726-
  • Case Name: MARBELLA MURRIETA BARAJAS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oAvoid Lien]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Motion to Avoid Lien (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Avoid Lien (Motion to)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.