U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02639-
  • Case Name: CHERYL RHOADES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (338 fee)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.