U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-bk-05278-
  • Case Name: NATHAN DAULTON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oApprove]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [CHAP Minute Entry]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [audio]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.