U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02636-
  • Case Name: ALIYAH COLLEAN KNOWLES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Correspondence]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.