U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10806-
  • Case Name: JUANITA GARCIA TAYLOR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Vacate (Motion to)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.