U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02634-
  • Case Name: LEBERTA FAY FLATT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Memo (Non QC for ProSe Form)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Amendment to Petition]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.