U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02623-
  • Case Name: Robert Kucera and Elizabeth Kucera
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (338 fee)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Declaration Regarding Electronic Submission (eSR only)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GOERNITZ, LOTHAR [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.