U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02621-
  • Case Name: DIANE MARGUERITA SENA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Ineligibility for Discharge]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 12 or 13) - VAN Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [ID Requested, Identity Confirmed Filed by Non Debtor]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.