U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02669-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL CHASE HARRELL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.