U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02657
  • Case Name: BERLEAN D MITCHELL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Affidavit]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [No Objection (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.