U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-01457-PS
  • Case Name: STEPHANIE MAURISSA MAY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Withdrawal of Report of No Distribution]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request to Set Claims Bar Date]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1 CREDITOR - Notice of Appearance/Request for Notice (batch) (document required)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.