U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00134-PS
  • Case Name: CAMERON NATHANIEL HAYES and AMANDA KAY HAYES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oRelief from Stay]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.