U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Vaught et al v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 05, 2025: [Statement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.