U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01018
  • Case Name: Columbie v. Olam Farming Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.