U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10648-
  • Case Name: KARINA MARIE ALANIS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Filing Fee Paid--Amendment]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Final Installment]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.