U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02681
  • Case Name: Deborah Hiibel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oReinstating Case]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.