U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02687-PS
  • Case Name: Rachel Creech
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oNonpayment of Required Filing Fee - VAN Form]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Response]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Filing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Filing Fee Paid--Amendment]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oNonpayment of Required Filing Fee - VAN Form]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Application for Access to Electronic Drop Box and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration Regarding Electronic Submission (eSR only)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oPay Filing Fee in Three Installments (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.