U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-08070-
  • Case Name: JOSEPH JOHN HAMMOND and PAULA CHRISTINA HAMMOND
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Submission of Proposed Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oAuthorize]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oExtend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.