U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00766-
  • Case Name: JAMES RUSSELL LEWIS and SASHA RENEE LEWIS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Appearance (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.