U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10763-PS
  • Case Name: SOHA A. CHAHROUR and MOHAMAD CHAHROUR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.