U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10515-
  • Case Name: Gloria Patricia Gamez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Change in Conduit Payment]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Objection/Evaluation - Amended or Modified Plan (Chapter 13) (batch)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.