U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-10258-
  • Case Name: THOMAS WAYNE MACPHEE, JR.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay (Motion for)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Operating Report]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Submission of Proposed Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Notice of)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oExtend]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Extend (Motion to)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Intent to Lodge Dismissal Order]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.