U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02686
  • Case Name: Brian Paul Neal and Sheryl Marcella Neal
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oReinstating Case]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.