U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02703-
  • Case Name: JONATHAN M. ABRAMS and SHANNA MARIE ABRAMS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.