U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02735
  • Case Name: TIFFANY ANNE LINGENFELTER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oJoint Administration]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Chapter 11 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Schedules]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Meeting of Creditors 11]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.