U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02732-
  • Case Name: ALTRAIN MEDICAL AND DENTAL ASSISTING ACADEMY, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Compel (Motion to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Notice of Filing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Preliminary Hearing (Notice of)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Payment (Motion for)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oWage Order]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oSetting Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oApprove]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oJoint Administration]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Schedules]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [CHAP Minute Entry Continued]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [audio]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Objection]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [oAccelerate/Expedite]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Accelerate/Expedite (Motion to)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Declaration]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Approve Use of Cash Collateral (Motion to)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Wage Order (Motion for)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Approve (Motion to)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Joint Administration (Motion for)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Notice of Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: COTTERMAN, JOSEPH ELDON [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [oChapter 11 Subchapter V Status Conference (EPB Form)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.