U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02715
  • Case Name: JOSEPH E LEAL and ELIZABETH ANN LEAL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.