U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-01029
  • Case Name: Pontikis v. Atieva Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 02, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Party)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 24, 2025: [Application for Entry of Default]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Allow Electronic Filing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 16, 2025: [Allow Electronic Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.