U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-09685-
  • Case Name: DAWN M BIANCO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Amended Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.