U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-11053-
  • Case Name: NICHOLAS JAMES WALL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice of Filing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Appearance (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.