U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02751-
  • Case Name: NORLEN AGUILERA VAZQUEZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.