U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-02110-
  • Case Name: LESA KAY MONTANA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Filing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oConfirming Chapter 13/12 Plan]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.