U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02762
  • Case Name: HAYLEY DUERETTA COLEMAN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.