U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-11162-
  • Case Name: DEVIN ROBERT SCHNACKENBERG and KRYSTAL L SCHNACKENBERG
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Appearance (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.