U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02759-PS
  • Case Name: JULIANNA HAMILTON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (338 fee)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [DeBN Debtor Electronic Noticing Request]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Initial Mailing List]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Correspondence]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.