U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02757-
  • Case Name: JAMIE LEE DUBY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Exhibit]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.