U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02754-
  • Case Name: MARK ANTHONY CARTER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oDenying Application of the Debtor for Waiver of the Chapter 7 FF(Form) (338 fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Schedules]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Schedules]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Summary of Schedules]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Schedules]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.