U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-ap-00116-
  • Case Name: HARRIS v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Complaint (Motion to)]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismiss Complaint (Motion to)]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Application for Access to Electronic Drop Box and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oMinute Entry Order]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend (Motion to)]
  • April 02, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued/Notice to Pro Se Plaintiff (Forms)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.