U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02791-
  • Case Name: ANDREW JOHN FETTERS and TERRI LYNN FETTERS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Periodic Report Regarding Entities in Which the Debtor Holds a Controlling Interest]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Pre-Status Conference Report]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [oAttorney or Other Professional Compensation (Application for)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Approve (Motion to)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Attorney or Other Professional Compensation (Application for)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Certificate of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Notice of Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [oChapter 11 Case Management Order (SHG Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CORRALES, JODY ANN [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Meeting of Creditors 11]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.