U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02786
  • Case Name: PAUL STEPHEN JOHNSON and JENNA DIANE JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Submitting]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Request for Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Schedules]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Individual Debtor's Statement of Intention]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Initial Mailing List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.