U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-11066-
  • Case Name: STEVEN ALBERT LIGHTFOOT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oDenying Reaffirmation Agreement (Moustafi Order) (BKM, DPC, PS)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [CHAP Minute Entry]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [audio]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.